+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 87-8 with Committee Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
- Introduced in House
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- To: Interim Joint Committee on Licensing and Occupations
+ − Amendment
HCS
Retain original provisions; change the requirements for registration as an alcohol and drug peer support specialist to include 16 hours of ethics training, instead of 6; amend KRS 309.084 to specify that the exempted requirement for an individual already certified is the 60 hour master's degree.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor