+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 38)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Transportation (S)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) received in Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)