+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 008)
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 3rd reading, passed 37-0 received in House
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Banking & Insurance (S)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) received in Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- reassigned to Banking & Insurance (H) posted in committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor