+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 51)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-1
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor