+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 114)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2013
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with floor amendment (1)
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HFA (1, T. Pullin)
Retain original provisions of the bill, and amend KRS 40.353 to broaden the eligibility criteria for the Kentucky Medal for Freedom recipients and allow the Department of Veterans Affairs to receive funds from the Veterans' Program Trust Fund to defray the cost of the Kentucky Medal for Freedom.