+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 3)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's Signature Acts, ch. 003
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 5, 2018
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To Agriculture
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor