+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 58-28 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2014
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 3, 2014
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HCS/FN
Retain original provisions; except delete definition for "board" and all references to licensure boards and establish new language specifying that practitioner prescribing and dispensing standards for expedited partner therapy shall follow CDC STD guidelines.
HFA (1, M. Marzian)
Retain original provisions except delete language related to the alleviation of civil and criminal liability.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor