+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (18) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (17) withdrawn
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (17) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendments (6), (7), (8), (9), (10), (11), (12), (13), (14), (15) and (16) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 17, 2020
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor