+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 149)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 28-6 received in House
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 2nd reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S) taken from State & Local Government (S) 1st reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 72-21 with Committee Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor