+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 096)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-2 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from Judiciary (S) 1st reading returned to Judiciary (S)
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House