+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 81)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Passed 93-4
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- To Rules (H)
- Received in House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from Transportation (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Transportation (S)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with floor amendment (2)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Floor amendment (2) filed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (3)
HFA (1, B. Yonts)
Expand the exemptions to include 49 CFR parts 390 to 399; apply those same exemptions to farm-registered vehicles which meet the same criteria as the original bill
HFA (2, B. Yonts)
Expand the exemptions to include 49 CFR sec. 390.21, requirement for a USDOT or KYDOT number on a vehicle, and 395, hours of service; apply those same exemptions to farm-registered vehicles which meet the same criteria as the original bill.
SCS
Retain provisions of the GA version with the following exemption: limit exemptions for non-farm intrastate commercial motor vehicles under 26,000 pounds to exemptions from 49 C.F.R. 391.41 to 391.49, dealing with medical qualifications of drivers, and 49 C.F.R. Part 395, dealing with hours of service.