+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 188)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2021 passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Transportation (S) 1st reading returned to Transportation (S)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Transportation (S)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Transportation (H)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).