+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 023)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- floor amendment (2) defeated House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) passed 56-39 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title) floor amendment (1) filed to Senate floor amendment (1), floor amendment (2) filed to Senate committee substitute, and floor amendment (3-title) filed to bill
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 27-9 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) received in House to Rules (H)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 1st reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-2
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor