+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- To Economic Development (H)
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS
Delete provisions relating to tax assessments; require LRC staff to study ways to encourage forest certification and the economic and constitutional issues surrounding the tax assessment of forest land.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor