+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 099)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 3rd reading, passed 32-4 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- passed 89-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) Vote on bill reconsidered placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House