+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2020
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House to State Government (H)
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor