+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 45)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Passed 96-0
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2012
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- To Labor & Industry (H)
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
SCS/LM
Retain the original provisions of the bill; clarify that an employer engages in a pattern of failing to timely respond to requests for information about a claim for benefits when the employer fails to respond to the greater of six times or to two percent of all requests within a calendar year.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor