+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 74)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 33-1 received in House
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-1 received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor