+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto of items numbered (3) (5) (7) (8) (9) and (13) sustained veto of other items overridden passed 73-24 received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto of items numbered (3) (5) (7) (8) (9) and (13) sustained veto of other items overridden passed 28-9 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 199)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- line items vetoed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1) Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate passed 35-0 received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report Free Conference Committee report adopted in House passed 93-3 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate Free Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 09, 2022 3rd reading, passed 30-6 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 85-8 with Committee Substitute
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 8, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Committee on Committees (H) 1st reading to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor