+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 5)
On January 8, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 08, 2022 3rd reading, passed 33-1 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) Bill passed 75-7 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 2nd reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 81-2 with Floor Amendments (1) and (2) received in Senate to State & Local Government (S) returned to State & Local Government (S) 1st reading taken from State & Local Government (S)
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 06, 2022 floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H) taken from Committee on Committees (H) 1st reading to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor