+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled on Wednesday, February 29, 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Transportation
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_SR1806_S_4327
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor