+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Not adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 14
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor