+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 18, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor