+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, Jan 30, 2013, 9:30 AM ROOM 546-E, CANCELLED
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 11, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor