+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 06 , 2016
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Ryckman Sr. and Representative Lusker appointed as conferees
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Wolf and Senator Pettey as conferees
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Peck was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Peck
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ethics and Elections
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2016, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2016_SB99_H_4076
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2016_SB99_H_4102
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Peck was rejected
CR_2016_SB99_S_2894
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor