+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 5, 2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 30, 2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 2
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 36 Nay: 1
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Transportation
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor