+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2017_SB97_S_2021
Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
CR_2017_SB97_S_0907
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor