+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 89 Nay: 30
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Davis
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 29, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 9
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CR_2011_SB97_H_2639
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2011_SB97_H_2837
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was rejected
CR_2011_SB97_H_1963
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
CR_2011_SB97_S_1182
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2011: Concurred with amendments
May 2, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 22, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor