+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 13 April 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 08, 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, January 24, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_SB9_H_2234
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_SB9_S_0985
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor