+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (57)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 6, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 13
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 73 Nay: 49
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as second conferees
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Petersen and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 49
- Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 56 Nay: 56
- Conference committee report now available
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Petersen is appointed to replace Senator Hilderbrand on the Conference Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Barker
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Barker was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 36
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Thomas
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Thomas was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. appointed as conferees
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was rejected Yea: 56 Nay: 66
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Resman
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Resman was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Woodard
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Awerkamp
- Representative Arnberger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Woodard was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Awerkamp was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 71
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Dietrich was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Thompson
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Thompson was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Dietrich
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Claeys was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Claeys
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 26 Nay: 12
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
- Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor