+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, June 7, 2017
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, May 31, 2017
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 15
- Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 16 Nay: 23
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 38
- Conference committee report now available
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Olson is appointed to replace Senator Estes on the Conference Committee
- Senator Estes is appointed to replace Senator LaTurner on the Conference Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator LaTurner , Senator Estes and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as conferees
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 08:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 27, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CCR_2017_SB83_H_2118
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 38
CCR_2017_SB83_H_2117
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2017_SB83_H_1801
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2017_SB83_S_0939
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor