+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2012
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Conference committee report now available
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 17 Nay: 22 (Remains in Conference)
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Representative Davis raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted Yea: 64 Nay: 51
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 66 Nay: 57
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
CCR_2012_SB83_H_5502
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2011_SB83_H_2394
Representative Davis raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
CR_2011_SB83_H_2238
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_SB83_S_1523
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (6)
May 9, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 8, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor