+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_SB81_S_1814
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Vote
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor