+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 3
- Substitute motion to lay on the table - motion to adopt Conference Committee Report; Motion not adopted. Yea: 9 Nay: 28
- Substitute motion to not adopt the Conference Committee Report and appoint a new Conference Committee; Motion not adopted.
- Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report.
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Conference committee report now available
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On May 4, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Slattery
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Slattery was rejected Yea: 46 Nay: 74
- Representative Smith raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_SB79_H_5346
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2011_SB79_S_1521
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
FA_2012_SB79_H_5141
Representative Smith raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
+ − Votes (6)
May 11, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 11, 2012: Substitute motion to lay on the table - motion to adopt Conference Committee Report; Motion not adopted.
May 7, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor