+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 19, 2021
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 14, 2021
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 7
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 7
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative S. Johnson, Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Peck and Senator Holscher as conferees
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance and Pensions
Type:
Primary Sponsor