+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor