+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
- Received and Introduced
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor