+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, January 28, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 19, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor