+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
- Conference committee report now available
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 99 Nay: 24
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor