+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 6
- Conference committee report now available
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senator Francisco replaces Senator Faust-Goudeau on the Conference Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Schwab, Representative Goico and Representative Mah appointed as conferees
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Huntington , Senator V. Schmidt and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 10
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mah
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed Committee on Elections
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics and Elections
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_SB67_H_2582
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 6
CR_2011_SB67_S_1369
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_SB67_H_1894
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 1, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 14, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ethics and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor