+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 2, 2021
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 26, 2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 2
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Received and Introduced
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor