+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
- Conference committee report now available
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 08, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2011_SB63_H_2887
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
CR_2011_SB63_H_2013
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2011_SB63_S_1525
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 9, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 22, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor