+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 10 May 2012
On May 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2012
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 23 Nay: 16
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Brungardt , Senator Reitz and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 95 Nay: 29
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Tietze
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tietze was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 03, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_SB62_H_5171
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tietze was rejected
CR_2011_SB62_S_1166
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 29, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor