+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pauls was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pauls
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative K. Wolf
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative K. Wolf was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kinzer
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 18, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (8)
CCR_2011_SB6_H_2895
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
FA_2011_SB6_H_2434
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative K. Wolf was rejected
FA_2011_SB6_H_2438
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was rejected
FA_2011_SB6_H_2431
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
FA_2011_SB6_H_2454
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pauls was adopted
CR_2011_SB6_H_1924
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
FA_2011_SB6_S_1338
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
CR_2011_SB6_S_1247
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 12, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 12, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 22, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor