+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 72 Nay: 50
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, April 15, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 15
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 67 Nay: 46
- Conference committee report now available
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Ousley appointed as second conferees
- Conference committee report now available
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Ousley is appointed to replace Representative Winn on the Conference Committee
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley on the Conference Committee
- Senator Baumgardner is appointed to replace Senator Warren on the Conference Committee
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Winn are appointed to replace Representative Patton, Representative Ralph, and Representative Carmichael on the Conference Committee
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Haley are appointed to replace Senator Tyson, Senator Alley, and Senator Holland on the Conference Committee
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Alley, Senator Claeys, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Corson on the Conference Committee
- Senator Tyson and Senator Alley are appointed to replace Senator Alley and Senator Claeys on the Conference Committee
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Corson is appointed to replace Senator Haley on the Conference Committee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor