+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Redistricting
- Received and Introduced
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 8
- Motion to advance to Final Action subject to amendment, debate, and roll call. Motion carried.
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Redistricting
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 28, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Redistricting
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor