+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received and Introduced
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 2, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor