+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Received and Introduced
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Education
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 22, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_SB51_S_1434
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
March 15, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor