+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 04 April 2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 29, 2013
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Received and Introduced
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 546-E
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2013: Final Action - Passed
February 13, 2013: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor