+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died in House Committee
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Received and Introduced
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2016_SB476_S_3870
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
CR_2016_SB476_S_3745
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor